Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nsighttel Wireless Llc Dba Cellcom, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Meverden, Kristi L, in the jurisdiction of Marinette County, WI, . Marinette County, WI Superior Courts with Sequin, Jane M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2023 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationMarinette County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket fee paid | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of entry of judgment
Judge: Brazeau, Carrie |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notes | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Electronic Notice Update | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Request | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Appearance of filing agent | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket fee paid | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return date
Judge: Brazeau, Carrie |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for financial disclosure
Judge: Kallgren, Nancy J. |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Default judgment
Judge: Brazeau, Carrie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.