Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Non-Traffic Ordinance Violation case in the jurisdiction of Marinette County, WI, . Marinette County, WI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2017 |
CategoryNon-Traffic Ordinance Violation |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMarinette County, WI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Warrant/Capias/Commitment canceled for Engel, Kyle Raymond | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Certification | |
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment for unpaid fine/forfeiture/other | |
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Commitment authorized for Engel, Kyle Raymond
Judge: Miron, David G. |
|
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Commitment issued for Engel, Kyle Raymond
Judge: Miron, David G. |
|
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event | File Retained Electronically | |
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment
Judge: Miron, David G. |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Default judgment entered
Judge: Miron, David G. |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dispositional order/judgment
Judge: Miron, David G. |
|
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.