Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Marathon County, WI, . Marathon County, WI Superior Courts with Strasser, Gregory J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 04, 2023 |
CategoryUnclassified |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMarathon County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order appointing GAL
Judge: Strasser, Gregory J. |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Report | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order appointing GAL
Judge: Strasser, Gregory J. |
|
November 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of hearing | |
November 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling order
Judge: Strasser, Gregory J. |
|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing De Novo
Judge: Strasser, Gregory J. |
|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of compliance | |
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Ley, Amanda J. |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Change of address notification |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.