Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Langlade County, WI, . Langlade County, WI Superior Courts with Rhode, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2023 |
CategoryTraffic Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationLanglade County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment
Judge: Rhode, John B. |
|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Default judgment entered
Judge: DeBord, Brent |
|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dispositional order/judgment
Judge: DeBord, Brent |
|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Charge amended | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Not guilty plea
Judge: DeBord, Brent |
|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Intake
Judge: DeBord, Brent |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of hearing | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation filed | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Case initiated by electronic filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.