Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Meyer, Tina, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Langlade County, WI, . Langlade County, WI Superior Courts with Rhode, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2022 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLanglade County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed order discharging special administrator
Judge: Rhode, John B. |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case disposed
Judge: Rhode, John B. |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order discharging special administrator
Judge: Rhode, John B. |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Special administration - petition for discharge
Judge: Rhode, John B. |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Receipt and release | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt and release
Judge: Rhode, John B. |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letters/correspondence
Judge: Rhode, John B. |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate claims notice
Judge: Rhode, John B. |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Claim against estate | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Claim against estate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.