Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Langlade County, WI, . Langlade County, WI Superior Courts with Rhode, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2022 |
CategoryFamily |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLanglade County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment after court trial
Judge: Kawalski, Fred |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Kawalski, Fred |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion hearing
Judge: Kawalski, Fred |
|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Waiver of service | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Confidential petition addendum | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.