Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Covantage Credit Union, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Bates, Justin James, against Schmidt, David J, Spouse, Unknown, in the jurisdiction of Langlade County, WI, . Langlade County, WI Superior Courts with Rhode, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 13, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLanglade County, WI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of judgment fee paid | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of judgment | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Full satisfaction | |
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Received documents | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Received documents | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Prop. order confirming sale
Judge: Rhode, John B. |
|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order confirming sale
Judge: Rhode, John B. |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of publication | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Other papers |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.