Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Kenosha County, WI, . Kenosha County, WI Superior Courts with Gerad Dougvillo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 08, 2022 |
CategoryTraffic Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedAugust 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKenosha County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Conviction status report | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Driver's license revocation hearing for Kewenig, Jennifer M
Judge: Dougvillo, Gerad T. |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dispositional order/judgment
Judge: Dougvillo, Gerad T. |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of hearing | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Electronic Filing Notice | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Converted to Electronic Filing | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Confidential disclosure of protected information for Kewenig, Jennifer M | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of intent to revoke operator's license for Kewenig, Jennifer M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.