Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Kenosha County, WI, . Kenosha County, WI Superior Courts with Dougvillo, Gerad T. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2022 |
CategoryTraffic Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKenosha County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final pre-trial
Judge: Dougvillo, Gerad T. |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final pre-trial
Judge: Dougvillo, Gerad T. |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judicial Pretrial - in court
Judge: Dougvillo, Gerad T. |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Not guilty plea
Judge: Keating, Loren |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Further proceedings
Judge: Keating, Loren |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Notes | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Further proceedings
Judge: Keating, Loren |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Further proceedings
Judge: Keating, Loren |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Further proceedings
Judge: Keating, Loren |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Further proceedings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.