Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kenosha County, WI, . Kenosha County, WI Superior Courts with Schroeder, Bruce E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 08, 2022 |
CategoryFamily |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKenosha County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Change of address notification | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment for unpaid fine/forfeiture/other | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Change of address notification | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Check/Disbursement | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Divorce/Annulment Worksheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.