Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Larmer, Lonnie M, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Larmer, Valerie J, in the jurisdiction of Juneau County, WI, . Juneau County, WI Superior Courts with Roemer, John P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoemer, John P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2015 |
CategoryFamily |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJuneau County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Default judgment
Judge: Roemer, John P. |
|
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment
Judge: Roemer, John P. |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Default divorce
Judge: Jefferson, William |
|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Change of address notification for Larmer, Lonnie M | |
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Change of address notification for Larmer, Lonnie M | |
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence | |
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Temporary order
Judge: Jefferson, William |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Response/reply | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence | |
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Financial Disclosure - Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.