Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, WI, . Jefferson County, WI Superior Courts with Dehring, Robert F., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 01, 2023 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationJefferson County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment of conviction
Judge: Hamre Incha, Cindy |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial appearance
Judge: Weber, Jennifer |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plea/sentencing hearing
Judge: Dehring, Robert F., Jr. |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Other papers | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Plea questionnaire, waiver of rights | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Appeal rights/info on postconviction relief |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.