Case Last Refreshed: 4 days ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Dane County, WI, . Dane County, WI Superior Courts with Crawford, Susan M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCrawford, Susan M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2024 |
CategoryForeclosure Of Mortgage |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDane County, WI |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Crawford, Susan M. |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Settlement/Stipulation to Dismiss - Before Trial
Judge: Crawford, Susan M. |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of service | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Lis pendens | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Electronic Notice Update | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Case initiated by electronic filing | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons and complaint | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Filing fee paid |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.