Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Dane County, WI, . Dane County, WI Superior Courts with Reynolds, Josann M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2024 |
CategoryBail Jumping |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDane County, WI |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Change of address notification | |
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Report | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion and demand for discovery | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Information | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Bound over for trial | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Arraignment
Judge: Commissioner, Preliminary Hearing |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Prelim questionnaire and waiver | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Waiver of preliminary hearing
Judge: Commissioner, Preliminary Hearing |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Return on warrant
Judge: Commissioner, Initial Appearance |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.