Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hillmann, Shawn R, against Knoll, Kevin Donald, in the jurisdiction of Dane County, WI, . Dane County, WI Superior Courts with Frost, Jacob presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrost, Jacob Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2023 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDane County, WI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Frost, Jacob |
|
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement/Stipulation to Dismiss - Before Trial
Judge: Frost, Jacob |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of service | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of service | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Electronic Notice Update | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Electronic Notice Update | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Lis pendens | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Electronic Notice Update |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.