Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Non-Traffic Ordinance Violation case in the jurisdiction of Buffalo County, WI, . Buffalo County, WI Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2017 |
CategoryNon-Traffic Ordinance Violation |
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationBuffalo County, WI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment for unpaid fine/forfeiture/other | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Failure to pay capias for Melby, Alan David
Judge: Duvall, James J |
|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice | |
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment
Judge: Duvall, James J |
|
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dispositional order/judgment
Judge: Schlosstein, Gary B. |
|
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Default judgment entered
Judge: Schlosstein, Gary B. |
|
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.