Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Unison Credit Union, filed a(n) Money Judgment case represented by Cerasoli, Steven J, against Garcia, Paola B., represented by Skatrud, Arne Richard, in the jurisdiction of Brown County, WI, . Brown County, WI Superior Courts with Walsh, Thomas J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2023 |
CategoryMoney Judgment |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBrown County, WI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket fee paid | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Default judgment
Judge: Walsh, Thomas J. |
|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for judgment
Judge: Walsh, Thomas J. |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of default | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters/correspondence | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling order
Judge: Walsh, Thomas J. |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for summary judgment | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit in support of motion | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Brief in support of motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.