Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Non-Traffic Ordinance Violation case in the jurisdiction of Barron County, WI, . Barron County, WI Superior Courts with Babbitt, James D. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2013 |
CategoryNon-Traffic Ordinance Violation |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBarron County, WI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment for unpaid fine/forfeiture/other | |
April 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment of conviction
Judge: Millermon, Sharon |
|
April 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Intake
Judge: Babbitt, James D. |
|
April 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Dispositional order/judgment
Judge: Babbitt, James D. |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Intake
Judge: Babbitt, James D. |
|
January 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons and complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.