Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Napa, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Soto, Miguel Angel, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Monique S. Langhorne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2010 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time181 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Child Custody or Visitation PROPOSED; Visitation/Other: Pick-Up/Drop-Off |
|
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
April 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order 914210-Order Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service ORDER [914210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
April 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing 931330-Request for Order Hrg (Mod); County of Napa vs. Soto, M. Motion OSC Details: 936810 - Return from FCS ; Judge: J21197 Langhorne Monique Judge: Langhorne, Monique |
|
April 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 913610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [913610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
April 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing 931330-Request for Order Hrg (Mod); County of Napa vs. Soto, M. Motion OSC Details: 921210 - Child Support ; Judge: J21197 Langhorne Monique Judge: Langhorne, Monique |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 912920-Notice of Hearing Motion/OSC Detail: 936810 - Return from FCS Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk NOTICE OF HEARING [912920] Motion: RETURN FROM FCS [936810] Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mediation Appointment 937910-Mediation Appointment; County of Napa vs. Soto, M. ; Mediator: FL0005 Mihm Maria Judge: Mihm, Maria |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.