Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Dba The Home Source Of Yakima, L-E Enterprises Inc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Seitz, Jon Lawson, against Selberg, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2022 |
CategoryUnd Residential Unlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Writ | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Writ -ROBERT CODY SELBERG |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Show Cause
Judge: Swan, Jeffery |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ of Restitution -ISSUED |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Directing Issuance of Writ
Judge: Naught, Kevin S |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment and Order for Writ of Restitution
Judge: Naught, Kevin S |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Default
Judge: Naught, Kevin S |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.