Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Guant, Chevelle Faith Marie, Holmes, Daniel Eric, Holmes, Jamie Renee, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts with Shane Silverthorn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShane Silverthorn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryMgc Minor Guardianship Custody |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice
Judge: Silverthorn, Shane M |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order (Agreed) To Dismiss Child Hayden Creach From Minor Guardianship Judge: Silverthorn, Shane M |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order (Agreed) for Cheyleigh Creach-Gaunt to be Returned to Mother's Care Judge: Silverthorn, Shane M |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Rodriguez-True, Sonia |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (MG) MOTHER GRANTED VISITATION; ALL OTHER RULINGS ON THE RECORD; CRT G/S ORDER ON MOTHERS VISITS; (SCHWAB / BUSHA / C. GUANT); MG SCFTR1 Judge: Rodriguez-True, Sonia |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order RE: Mother's Visitation Judge: Rodriguez-True, Sonia |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Sealed Personal Health Care Records Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.