Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Matson, Carmen E, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Matson, Roderick J, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2021 |
CategoryDin Dissolution Of Marriage With No Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Rodriguez-True, Sonia |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Bartheld, Richard H |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Family Law Order
Judge: Naught, Kevin S |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Status Conference
Judge: Naught, Kevin S |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order RE PROPERTY PURCHASE Judge: Naught, Kevin S |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Rodriguez-True, Sonia |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order RE MAINTENANCE Judge: Swan, Jeffery |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order
Judge: Rodriguez-True, Sonia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.