Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Valenzuela Reyes, Sugenia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ottem, Sidney Phillip, against Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Kwik Lok Corporation, represented by Shea, Timothy D, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts with Susan C. Arb presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan C. Arb Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal STIP Judge: Arb, Susan |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action Without Order ORCDER SIGNED IN CHAMBERS. Judge: Arb, Susan |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address RE WOOD, SMITH, HENNING & BERMAN LLP |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.