Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Anguiano, Jorge, Gonzalez, Dionisio, Herrera Gonzalez, Ramiro, Mariscal, Glicerio, Ramirez, Silvestre, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Valencia, Erika, against 3W Trucking, Doe, Bob, Werst, Gerald, represented by Wixson, Sarah Lynn Clarke, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts with Susan C. Arb presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan C. Arb Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2019 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated
Judge: Arb, Susan |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing motion to enforce Court Order Judge: Swan, Jeffery |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket -RENOTE |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer TO AMENDED COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.