Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
B.F., filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case against Drb Capital Llc, represented by Okner, Paul, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 03, 2019 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Arb, Susan |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Structure Settlement (Atty Paul Okner via Court Call @2:00 p.m.) |
|
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Note for Calendar | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Application for Crt Approval -Amended |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petition RE: TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.