Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Villalovos, Lori M, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case represented by Hansen, George, against Department Of Licensing State Of Washington, represented by Becker, Dale E., in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2015 |
CategoryAlr Administrative Law Review |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal
Judge: Arb, Susan |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
May 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution -DECLARATION OF MAILING |
|
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Mandate | |
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 6: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter 5: LETTER TO COA/SENT AMENDED NTC; APPEAL RE; APPEAL IS 'TO SUPERIOR; COURT'; |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal to Superior Court 4: AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL TO; SUPERIOR COURT; |
|
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Letter 3: LETTER TO COA/SENT DIRECT APPEAL; |
|
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 2: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.