Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Moon, Hae H H W, Moon, Khurk, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Mittendorf, Sue, Kang, Henry S, Donka Llc, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2010 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 6: STIPULATION & ORDER OF DISMISSAL; (LUST); |
|
November 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Ex Parte | |
November 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Withdraw 5: NOTICE OF INTENT TO WITHDRAW; |
|
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 4: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 3: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
January 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 2: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint 1: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; |
|
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.