Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Licensing - Administrative case against Department Of Licensing, represented by Mcdaniel, Diane L., in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2009 |
CategoryDol Appeal Licensing Revocation |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeLicensing |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal 10: CLERK'S ORDER OF DISMISSAL; (HARTHCOCK); |
|
March 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING; | |
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 9: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; |
|
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Answer 8: ANSWER; |
|
December 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 7: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
December 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 6: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
December 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Return of Service 5: RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
December 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Ex Parte | |
December 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause 4: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.