Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Asset Acceptance Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Suttell & Hammer P.S., against Gonzales, Mariela G, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2008 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order GRANTING PETITION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition For Renewal Of Judgment |
|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Change Of Firm Name |
|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 11: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 10: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT -ISSUED; |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 9: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
October 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 8: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
September 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 7: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT -ISSUED; |
|
September 26, 2012 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); | |
September 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 6: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.