Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Diraimo, Aaron Asher filed a(n) Cpo Civil Protection Order case in the jurisdiction of Whitman County, WA, . Whitman County, WA Superior Courts with Douglas B. Robinson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
CategoryCpo Civil Protection Order |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWhitman County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Protection
Judge: Robinson, Douglas B |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Robinson, Douglas B |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Protection Order
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Court Decision After Trial | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Service | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order for Protection AMENDED |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order for Protection AMENDED VERSION FILED 2/1/23 |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Transferring Domestic Violence Action | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Order for Protection |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.