Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dabco Property Management, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Rembert, Robert W, against Mubarak, Shima, in the jurisdiction of Whitman County, WA, . Whitman County, WA Superior Courts with Gary J. Libey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2023 |
CategoryUnd Residential Unlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWhitman County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Writ | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Restitution AMENDED |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Restitution AMENDED VERSION FILED 2/24/2023 |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Praecipe | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Writ of Restitution
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Show Cause
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Order to Show Cause |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.