Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ritter, Catrina Grace filed a(n) Cpo Civil Protection Order case in the jurisdiction of Whitman County, WA, . Whitman County, WA Superior Courts with Gary J. Libey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2023 |
CategoryCpo Civil Protection Order |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWhitman County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Report QUALITY BEHAVIORAL HEALTH |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Protection Order
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Striking Hearing |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.