Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Washington State University, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Factory Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Sekits, Matthew J, in the jurisdiction of Whitman County, WA, . Whitman County, WA Superior Courts with Gary J. Libey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWhitman County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Praecipe | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order VACATING ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL Judge: Libey, Gary |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit A BROOSLIN |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.