Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Benson, Jessica, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Shepherd, Douglas Ross, against Paz, John Doe, Paz, Nicole, Peacehealth, Peacehealth St Joseph Medical Center Foundation, represented by Curry, Farron, in the jurisdiction of Whatcom County, WA, . Whatcom County, WA Superior Courts with Lee Grochmal presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLee Grochmal Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 19, 2021 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWhatcom County, WA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal and Stipulation to Void Judgment with Prejudice Judge: Grochmal, Lee P |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mandate COA - Voluntary Dismissal |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed of Clerks Papers Vol 2 to COA |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Index to Clerks Papers Vol 2 |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Designation of Clerks Papers Appellants Supplemental |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Index to Clerks Papers Vol 1 |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed of Clerks Papers Vol 1 to COA |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed of Notice of Appeal to COA |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service of Notice of Appeal with COA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.