Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fadhel, Nasir, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Robey, Steven Michael, against Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Owens, Michelle Monique, Vandenbelt, Jenny Anna, in the jurisdiction of Whatcom County, WA, . Whatcom County, WA Superior Courts with Jonathan L. Richardson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJonathan L. Richardson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWhatcom County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated
Judge: Richardson, Jonathan |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Void Sub Number Voided | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Transferring to Civil Arbitration
Judge: Henley, Leon F, Jr |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Hearing
Judge: Grochmal, Lee P |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Demand For Arbitration |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings on Demand for Arbitration |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury 12 Person | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.