Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pendergrast Holdings Llc, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Lee, Mark J., against Lamont, Jacob, Jjf Llc, represented by Paine, Nathan, in the jurisdiction of Whatcom County, WA, . Whatcom County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 03, 2021 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationWhatcom County, WA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated and Final Judgment Judge: Henley, Leon F, Jr |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation to Entry of Final Judgment & Order of Dismissal of Claims |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint for Fraud and Breach of Contract / Rent Due |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.