Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Logan, John, Mclean Family Limited Partnership, Mclean, John, Mclean Management Trust, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Nansen, Peter Dirk, Nansen, Teresa S, in the jurisdiction of Whatcom County, WA, . Whatcom County, WA Superior Courts with Lee Grochmal presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2015 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWhatcom County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial 3 days Judge: Grochmal, Lee P |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Discovery
Judge: Grochmal, Lee P |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Third Motion to Compel Discovery |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability Atty Julie Herber |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Trial Date
Judge: Grochmal, Lee P |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Compelling Discovery
Judge: Grochmal, Lee P |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Assignment of Trial Date - JA |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Grochmal, Lee P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.