Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Drowley, Richard Douglas, against Flannery, Jane Doe, Flannery, Spencer M, in the jurisdiction of Whatcom County, WA, . Whatcom County, WA Superior Courts with Leon F. Henley, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2015 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWhatcom County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 20: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; |
|
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 19: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (WELLS FARGO BANK); |
|
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 18: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (INDUSTRIAL CREDIT UNTION); |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISS/CPY FILED; | |
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 17: AFFIDAVIT FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (WELLS FARGO BANK); |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 16: AFFIDAVIT FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (INDUSTRIAL CREDIT UNION); |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant 15: JDGMT ON ANSWER OF GARN DEF; (WELLS FARGO); COMMISSIONER ALFRED L. HEYDRICH; |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application 14: APPLICATION FOR JUDGMT ON ANSWER &; ORDER TO PAY; WELLS FARGO BANK; |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of NonMilitary Service 13: NON-MILITARY STATEMENT DEPT OF; DEFENSE PRINTOUT; |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 12: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.