Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Weiler Yancey, Caroline S, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Brandt, Michael David, Derenick, Kelby J, against The Trees Condominiums Home Owners Association, represented by Hall, Ryan J, in the jurisdiction of Walla Walla County, WA, . Walla Walla County, WA Superior Courts with M. Scott Wolfram presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeM. Scott Wolfram Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2020 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWalla Walla County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal & Stipulation Judge: Carman, Janelle |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial-12 | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Continue | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial Date Jury Trial March 18-22, 2024 @ 9:30 |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion Petition | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit Lauren Fugere |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.