Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Collection Bureau Of Walla Walla, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Granados, Demetrius S, Granados, Rennae A, in the jurisdiction of Walla Walla County, WA, . Walla Walla County, WA Superior Courts with Brandon L. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryFju Foreign Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWalla Walla County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerks Trust Fund Ledger | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment & Order To Pay Judge: Johnson, Brandon L |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion and Affidavit Declaration | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 2nd |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 1st |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Application | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.