Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Walker, Kevin, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Walla Walla County, WA, . Walla Walla County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryEst Estate |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWalla Walla County, WA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing 22: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Declaration of Completion 21: NOTICE FILING DECLAR OF COMPLETION; |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipts 19: RECEIPT(S) -KEVIN S WALKER; |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Completion 20: DECLARATION OF COMPLETION; |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipts 18: RECEIPT(S) -DANIEL ROACH; |
|
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Assignment 16: ASSIGNMENT AND QUITCLAIM; DEBBIE A WALKER; |
|
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Assignment 17: ASSIGNMENT AND QUITCLAIM; JANET D KNAPP; |
|
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Assignment 15: ASSIGNMENT AND QUITCLAIM; DARLENE A JOHNSON; |
|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction 14: SATISFACTION OF CREDITORS CLAIM; DELL FINANCIAL SERVICES; |
|
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Creditors Claim 13: CREDITOR'S CLAIM - $779.35; DELL FINANCIAL SERVICES; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.