Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Mercado, Christopher Jason, against Zohner, Daryl, Zohner, Jane Doe H W, in the jurisdiction of Walla Walla County, WA, . Walla Walla County, WA Superior Courts with M. Scott Wolfram presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeM. Scott Wolfram Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2016 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWalla Walla County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerks Trust Fund Ledger | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant
Judge: Wolfram, M. Scott |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Application | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement Non Military |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 15: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT-2ND; |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 14: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT-1ST; |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 13: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.