Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Julienne L. Rynda presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 09, 1991 |
CategoryFamily Support |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2003 | Docket Event | Abstract of Support Judgment | |
January 21, 2003 | Docket Event | Abstract of Support Judgment | |
January 16, 1998 | Docket Event | Abstract of Support Judgment | |
August 02, 1991 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Entry of Judgment and Judgment | |
May 09, 1991 | Docket Event |
Gov Comp Est Par Rel & C/S
Judge: Rynda, Julienne L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.