Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
City Of Waitsburg, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Hedine, Kristian Einar, against French, James W, in the jurisdiction of Walla Walla County, WA, . Walla Walla County, WA Superior Courts with Kristian E. Hedine presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2005 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWalla Walla County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 11: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; |
|
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
September 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 09: AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION OF SERVICE; |
|
September 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 10: AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION OF SERVICE; |
|
August 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 08: AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION OF SERVICE; 6/28/05; |
|
June 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing 07: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; |
|
June 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice 06: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS; |
|
June 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Summons 05: SUMMONS; |
|
June 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.