Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lyski, Ilene, Lyski, Jerry, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Winkles, Erin Helen, against Lavoie Family Construction Llc, Lavoie, Luke, Lavoie, Nicol, represented by Mcreary, Craig Michael, in the jurisdiction of Wahkiakum County, WA, . Wahkiakum County, WA Superior Courts with Heidi L. Heywood presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 12, 2020 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWahkiakum County, WA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Modifying Judgment |
|
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Heywood, Heidi L |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Richter, Donald J |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Correspondence to Strike Hearing |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Heywood, Heidi L |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.