Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Barton, Charles Thomas filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Wahkiakum County, WA, . Wahkiakum County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2015 |
CategoryDvp Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWahkiakum County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Invoice Voucher 13: INVOICE VOUCHER-COURT INTERPRETER; |
|
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order 12: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; COMMISSIONER TIMOTHY M. HANIGAN; |
|
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order for Compensation 11: ORDER FOR COMPENSATION: INTERPRETER; |
|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 10: MOTION HEARING; COMMISSIONER TIMOTHY M. HANIGAN; |
|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition 9: ORDER DENYING MOTION/PETITION; |
|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Report 8: REPORT OF INCIDENT; |
|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
C Civil ORDER FOR PROTECTION |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 7: DECLARATION OF RESPONDENT; |
|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 6: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Receipts 5: RECEIPT FROM WCSO; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.