Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Alexander, James, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cotterell, Lindsey D, against Howell, Kimberly J., Howell, Michael T., Scarth, Lynnea R., represented by Lillegren, Shawn Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Wahkiakum County, WA, . Wahkiakum County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2013 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWahkiakum County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduled -: NOTICE FOR TRIAL SETTING; 01-13-2015; 3 DAY JURY TRIAL; |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order 16: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; JUDGE PRO TEM-FAUBION; |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 15: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
November 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Trial Cancelled Defense Respondent Requested -: TRIAL CANCELLED:DEF/RESP REQUESTED; |
|
November 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
C Civil SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduled 9: NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE; 08-19-2014; 3-DAY JURY TRIAL; |
|
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice for Trial Setting -: NOTICE FOR TRIAL SETTING; 01-13-2015; 3 DAY JURY TRIAL; |
|
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice 14: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; 11-21-2014C; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; |
|
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Trial Continued Stipulated -: TRIAL CONTINUED: STIPULATED; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.