Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Elkinton, Benjamin J., Elkinton Enterprises Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Warthen Industrial Const., Inc, Warthen, Joel W., in the jurisdiction of Wahkiakum County, WA, . Wahkiakum County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 12, 2008 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWahkiakum County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice -: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order 15: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; COMMISSIONER TIMOTHY M. HANIGAN; |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 14: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
June 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduled 11: DECLARATION OF MAILING; 06-07-2010; CLERK'S ORDER OF DISMISSAL; |
|
May 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Certificate 13: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; |
|
May 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Report 12: REPORT - STATUS; |
|
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 10: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; |
|
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 11: DECLARATION OF MAILING; 06-07-2010; CLERK'S ORDER OF DISMISSAL; |
|
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Certificate 9: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.