Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Prime Locations Inc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Wertjes, Alan J, against Satterwhite, Leann, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with John C. Skinder presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2023 |
CategoryUnd Residential Unlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Writ | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Restitution | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Uncontested Resolution Hearing | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Writ of Restitution | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Show Cause
Judge: Skinder, John C |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Postingg |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Summons | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate Dispute Resolution |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.