Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Martin Way Plaza Llc, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Penoyar, William Robin, against Holmberg, Aaron, Western Surety Company, in the jurisdiction of Thurston County, WA, . Thurston County, WA Superior Courts with Carol Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarol Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2022 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationThurston County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial
Judge: Murphy, Carol |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference
Judge: Murphy, Carol |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings Agreed Order of Dismissal |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition Order of Dismissal |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing to Dismiss Counterclaims Judge: Murphy, Carol |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.